Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/05/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/05/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/05/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/05/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/05/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/05/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/05/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/05/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/05/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/19/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2001