Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/14/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/20/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/20/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/16/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2002