Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/18/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/18/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/05/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/05/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/05/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/19/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/19/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/19/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2002