Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/30/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 01/30/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/01/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/04/2002