Text: H.Con.Res.311 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (02/28/2002)

 
[Congressional Bills 107th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 311 Engrossed in House (EH)]

  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
  
107th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 311

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Whereas the Civil Air Patrol was established on December 1, 1941, in the Office 
        of Civilian Defense;
Whereas during World War II the volunteer units of the Civil Air Patrol 
        conducted search and rescue missions, provided air transportation for 
        military personnel and cargo, towed targets for the training of Army Air 
        Corps gunners, and patrolled the coasts of the United States searching 
        for enemy submarines;
Whereas by the end of World War II the Civil Air Patrol had flown more than 
        500,000 hours, sunk 2 German U-boats, and saved hundreds of crash 
        victims;
Whereas on July 1, 1946, the Civil Air Patrol was chartered by the United States 
        as a nonprofit, benevolent corporation;
Whereas on May 26, 1948, the Civil Air Patrol was permanently established as a 
        volunteer auxiliary of the United States Air Force;
Whereas since 1942 the cadet programs of the Civil Air Patrol have trained 
        approximately 750,000 youth, providing them with leadership and life 
        skills;
Whereas since 1942 the Civil Air Patrol has flown more than 1,000,000 hours of 
        search and rescue missions, saving several thousand lives; and
Whereas since 1951 the aerospace education programs of the Civil Air Patrol have 
        provided training and educational materials to more than 300,000 
        teachers, who have educated more than 8,000,000 students about 
        aerospace: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress recognizes the Civil Air Patrol for 60 years of service 
to the United States.

            Passed the House of Representatives February 28, 2002.

            Attest:

                                                                 Clerk.
107th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                            H. CON. RES. 311

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Recognizing the Civil Air Patrol for 60 years of service to the United 
                                States.

Share This Section