Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/27/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2002