Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/07/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/07/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/06/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/19/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/09/2002