Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/22/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/22/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/23/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/23/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/23/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/20/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/12/2002