Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/28/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/28/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/13/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/13/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/15/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2002