Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/13/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/19/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/19/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/10/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/10/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/25/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2002