Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/20/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/11/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/11/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/17/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/25/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/07/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/16/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/16/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/25/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/25/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/11/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/11/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/11/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/17/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/26/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/26/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/07/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/07/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/07/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/10/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/16/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/24/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/13/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/13/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/13/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/13/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/13/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/13/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/13/2002