Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/25/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/25/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/01/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/01/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/03/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/03/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/03/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/03/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/03/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/03/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/09/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/04/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/21/2002