Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 02/28/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/28/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/28/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/22/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/02/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/17/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/17/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/26/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/26/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/01/2001