Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/20/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/04/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/04/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/12/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/12/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/17/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/17/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/17/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/17/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/17/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/17/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/17/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/17/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/18/2002