Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/09/2001