Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/23/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/06/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/07/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/07/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/07/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/08/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/10/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/10/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/15/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/15/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/16/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/16/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/16/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/16/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/16/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/16/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/21/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/22/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/04/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/04/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/04/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/27/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/08/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/10/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/15/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/17/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/2002