Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/29/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/29/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/29/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/30/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/02/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/02/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/02/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/06/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/06/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/06/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/06/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/06/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/07/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/14/2002