There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring and commending the Lao Veterans of America, Laotian and Hmong veterans of the Vietnam War, and their families, for their historic contributions to the United States.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/17/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10777)
10/10/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H7883)
10/10/2002Committee on International Relations discharged.
05/20/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/18/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/17/2002SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10777)
10/15/2002SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/10/2002-11:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/2002-11:34pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7883)
10/10/2002-11:34pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7859-7887)
10/10/2002-11:34pmHouseMr. Armey asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/10/2002HouseCommittee on International Relations discharged.
05/20/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/20/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/23/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/22/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/04/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/17/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/10/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/20/2002 Referred to
10/10/2002 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.406.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.406. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/10/2002)

Honors and commends the Lao Veterans of America, Laotian and Hmong veterans of the Vietnam War who served with or assisted the U.S. armed forces, and their families for their historic contributions to the United States.