Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/23/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/22/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/04/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/17/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/10/2002