Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/11/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/25/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/25/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/27/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/08/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/08/2002