Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/13/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/13/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/18/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/18/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2002