Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 06/18/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/16/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/19/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/19/2002