Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/27/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/16/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/23/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/23/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/26/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/26/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/26/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/05/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/05/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/05/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/05/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2002