Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/17/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/18/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/22/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/23/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/23/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/15/2002