Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/23/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/17/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/25/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/01/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/01/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 10/01/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/09/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/16/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2002