Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/24/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/24/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/24/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/09/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/09/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/25/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/25/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/25/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/25/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/07/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/07/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/10/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/13/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/13/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/13/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/13/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/13/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/13/2002