Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/28/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/08/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/08/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/08/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/19/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/19/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/19/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/19/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/21/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/12/2001