Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/09/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/17/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/19/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/19/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/26/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/26/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/26/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/01/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/03/2002