Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/19/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/24/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/01/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/01/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/01/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/10/2002