Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/25/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/02/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/07/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/10/2002