Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/08/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/08/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/09/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/09/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/10/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/15/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/15/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/15/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/15/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/15/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/15/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/15/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/16/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/16/2002