Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/09/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/24/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/24/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/24/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/31/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/31/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/31/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/12/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/19/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/19/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/19/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/22/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/22/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew