Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/03/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2001