There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the printing of a revised and updated version of the House document entitled "Women in Congress, 1917-1990".


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/24/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/2001Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3866)
04/04/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 79).(text: CR 4/3/2001 H1380)
03/15/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
04/25/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/24/2001SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/2001SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3866)
04/05/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
04/04/2001-10:37amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/04/2001-10:37amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 79). (text: CR 4/3/2001 H1380)
04/04/2001-10:13amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1415-1416)
04/03/2001-5:07pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/03/2001-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 66.
04/03/2001-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1380-1384)
04/03/2001-4:33pmHouseMr. Ney moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
03/15/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/15/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 03/15/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/15/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration03/15/2001 Referred to
Senate Rules and Administration04/05/2001 Referred to
04/24/2001 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.66.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.66. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/04/2001)

Authorizes the printing as a House document of an updated version of House Document 101-238 (as revised by the Library of Congress) entitled "Women in Congress, 1917-1990."