Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/04/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/01/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/10/2002