Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/25/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/25/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/27/2001