Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/28/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002