Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2002