Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/09/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/28/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/13/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/06/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2002