Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/02/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/2001