Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/08/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/08/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/19/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/19/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/25/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/25/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/10/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/10/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/31/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/31/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/31/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/31/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/24/2001