There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Approving the extension of nondiscriminatory treatment with respect to the products of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2001Became Public Law No: 107-52. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2001Signed by President.
10/09/2001Presented to President.
10/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay. 88 - 12. Record Vote Number: 291.
09/06/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H5427)
09/05/2001Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-198.
06/12/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/2001Became Public Law No: 107-52. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2001Signed by President.
10/09/2001HousePresented to President.
10/04/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay. 88 - 12. Record Vote Number: 291.
10/03/2001SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S10105-10126)
10/02/2001SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S10056)
10/02/2001SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate.
09/10/2001SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154.
09/06/2001-3:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/06/2001-3:55pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text: CR H5427)
09/06/2001-3:55pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House.
09/06/2001-2:12pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to a previous order, the House proceeded with 2 hours of debate on H.J. Res. 51.
09/06/2001-2:12pmHouseConsidered by previous order of the House. (consideration: CR H5427-5440)
09/06/2001-2:12pmHouseConsideration initiated by previous order of the House.
09/05/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 116.
09/05/2001HouseReported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-198.
07/26/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/26/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/12/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/12/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/12/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/12/2001 Referred to
07/26/2001 Markup by
09/05/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-198

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.51. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/05/2001)

Approves the extension of nondiscriminatory treatment (normal trade relations treatment) to the products of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam.