Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/24/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/25/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/12/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/17/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/05/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/30/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/06/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/26/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/28/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/28/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/05/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/07/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/11/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/25/2002