Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/16/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/16/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/16/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/16/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/16/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/16/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/16/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/16/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/25/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/25/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/25/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/25/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/25/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/25/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/25/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/25/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/25/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/30/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/30/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/30/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/01/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/24/2002