There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Patriot Day resolution (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Amending title 36, United States Code, to designate September 11 as Patriot Day.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/18/2001Became Public Law No: 107-89. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2001Signed by President.
12/06/2001Presented to President.
11/30/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2001Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12272-12773)
10/25/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 407 - 0 (Roll no. 407).(text of measure as passed House: CR H7318)
10/25/2001Committee on Government Reform discharged.
10/25/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/18/2001Became Public Law No: 107-89. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2001Signed by President.
12/06/2001HousePresented to President.
12/03/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2001SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2001SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12272-12773)
10/31/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/25/2001SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/25/2001-1:03pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 407 - 0 (Roll no. 407). (text of measure as passed House: CR H7318)
10/25/2001-1:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/25/2001-12:35pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House.
10/25/2001-11:39amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 71.
10/25/2001-11:39amHouseConsidered by previous order of the House. (consideration: CR H7317-7325)
10/25/2001-11:39amHouseConsideration initiated by previous order of the House.
10/25/2001HouseCommittee on Government Reform discharged.
10/25/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
10/25/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform10/25/2001 Referred to
10/25/2001 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/31/2001 Referred to
11/30/2001 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.71. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/25/2001)

Designates September 11 as Patriot Day. Requests the President to issue a proclamation each year regarding the observation of Patriot Day and the display of the U.S. flag at half staff in honor of individuals who lost their lives as a result of the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001.