There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Continuing Appropriation FY2002 (Eighth) (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year 2002, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2001Became Public Law No: 107-97. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2001Signed by President.
12/21/2001Presented to President.
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14029)
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H10934)
12/19/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2001Became Public Law No: 107-97. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2001Signed by President.
12/21/2001HousePresented to President.
12/20/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14029)
12/20/2001-11:00amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2001-10:59amHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text: CR H10934)
12/20/2001-10:59amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/20/2001-10:56amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 79.
12/20/2001-10:56amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 79 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
12/20/2001-10:56amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 323. (consideration: CR H10934)
12/20/2001-10:22amHouseRule H. Res. 323 passed House.
12/20/2001-4:12amHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 323 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 79 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
12/19/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
12/19/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations12/19/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.79. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/20/2001)

Extends the law making continuing appropriations for FY 2002 through January 10, 2002.

Provides that funds shall be available and obligations for mandatory payments due on or about January 1, 2002, may continue to be made.