Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/26/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/27/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/04/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/04/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/17/2002