Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/11/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/11/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/25/2002