Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/09/2002