Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/14/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/15/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/15/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/21/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/23/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/04/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/13/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/13/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/24/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/24/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/2002